Major General Johnson Aguiyi-Ironsi |
---|
|
|
2nd Head of State of Nigeria |
---|
In office 16 January 1966 – 19 July 1966 |
Preceded by | Nnamdi Azikiwe |
---|
Succeeded by | Yakubu Gowon |
---|
General Officer Commanding, Nigerian Army |
---|
In office 1965 – January 1966 |
Preceded by | Major General Sir Christopher Welby-Everard |
---|
Succeeded by | Yakubu Gowon |
---|
Personal details |
---|
Born | 3 March 1924 Umuahia, Abia State, Nigeria |
---|
Died | 29 July 1966 Lalupon, Oyo Nigeria |
---|
Nationality | Nigerian |
---|
Political party | None (military) |
---|
Spouse(s) | Victoria Aguyi-Ironsi |
---|
Military service |
---|
Allegiance | Nigeria |
---|
Service/branch | Nigerian Army |
---|
Years of service | 1942–1966 |
---|
Rank | Major General |
---|
Unit | Commander, 2nd Brigade |
---|
Commands | Force Commander, ONUC |
---|
Battles/wars | World War II |
---|
Johnson Thomas Umunnakwe Aguiyi-Ironsi (3 March 1924 – 29 July 1966) was a senior Nigerian military officer and the first Nigerian Military Head of State. He seized power in the ensuing chaos following the 15 January 1966 military coup, serving as the Nigerian Head of State from 16 January 1966 until his murder on 29 July 1966 by a group of mutinous Northern army soldiers who revolted against his government in what was popularly called the July Counter Coup. The nightstand of the time he was. He was used to salvage the situation, but this rather led to a grievous catastrophic dilemma for the entire country. Today both the people of Biafra and Nigeria are still to recover from the experience.
Johnson Aguiyi-Ironsi Place, Nationality, ethnicity, Hometown, Zodiac Sign, Debut, Film TV, muscles, Weight, Music, Wiki, Girlfriend, News
Share this
Johnson Aguiyi-Ironsi Place, Nationality, ethnicity, Hometown, Zodiac Sign, Debut, Film TV, muscles, Weight, Music, Wiki, Girlfriend, News
SUBSCRIBE OUR NEWSLETTER
Join us for free and get valuable content delivered right through your inbox.